EP0327982 - Transcoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 D-78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 D-7730 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Saarstrasse 22 D-3005 Hemmingen 1 / DE | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/13] |
Former [1989/33] | Körner, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101857.4 | 03.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | DE19883803835 | 09.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803835 | [1989/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327982 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327982 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
H04N7/012 (EP);
H04N7/01 (KR);
H04N7/0137 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | Transcoder | [1989/33] | English: | Transcoder | [1989/33] | French: | Transcodeur | [1989/33] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 27.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.02.1993 | BE | 03.02.1993 | GR | 03.02.1993 | CH | 28.02.1993 | LI | 28.02.1993 | LU | 28.02.1993 | GB | 03.05.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/32] | AT | 03.02.1993 | |
BE | 03.02.1993 | ||
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
GB | 03.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | BE | 03.02.1993 | |
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
GB | 03.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | BE | 03.02.1993 | |
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 03.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | DE3304030 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | DE3542102 [ ] (RCA CORP [US]); | DE3444836 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | DE3625932 [ ] (RCA CORP [US]) |