EP0331908 - Method for forming high density, ohmic contact multi-level metallurgy for semiconductor devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farrar, Paul Alden 17 Yandow Drive South Burlington Vermont 05403 / US | 02 /
Geffken, Robert Michael 88 Gosse Court Burlington Vermont 05401 / US | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Mönig, Anton IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101915.0 | 03.02.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | US19880164692 | 07.03.1988 Original published format: US 164692 | [1989/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331908 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L21/90, H01L23/52 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
H01L23/53219 (EP);
H01L21/768 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von hochintegrierter mehrschichtiger Metallurgie mit ohmischen Kontakten für Halbleitervorrichtungen | [1989/37] | English: | Method for forming high density, ohmic contact multi-level metallurgy for semiconductor devices | [1989/37] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de la partie métallurgique à contact ohmique, à plusieurs niveaux et à haute intégration pour dispositifs semi-conducteurs | [1989/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/02] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0239756 ; | [AD]EP0066069 | [A] - 1984 PROCEEDINGS, IEEE VLSI MULTILEVEL INTERCONNECTION CONFERENCE, New Orleans, 21st-22nd June 1984, pages 1-21, IEEE, New York, US; A.N. SAXENA: "VLSI multilevel metallizations: Present status and future requirements" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS, IEEE 32nd ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS CONFERENCE, San Diego, 10th-12th May 1982, pages 309-313, IEEE, New York, US; D.A. GROSE et al.: "A simple evaporation process for producing improved interlevel via resistance" |