EP0328016 - Cased telescoped ammunition round [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC. 5901 Lincoln Drive Edina Minnesota 55436 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states ALLIANT TECHSYSTEMS INC. 5901 Lincoln Drive Edina, Minnesota 55436 / US | ||
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martwick, Wilford E. 7703 - 49th Avenue North Minneapolis, MN 55428 / US | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/45] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/33] | Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Kaiserleistrasse 39 Postfach 10 08 65 W-6050 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101985.3 | 04.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | US19880154560 | 10.02.1988 Original published format: US 154560 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0328016 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0328016 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F42B5/02 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
F42B33/001 (EP,US);
F42B5/045 (EP,US);
F42B5/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/33] | Title | German: | Teleskopische Munition mit Hülse | [1989/33] | English: | Cased telescoped ammunition round | [1989/33] | French: | Munition téléscopique avec douille | [1989/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1353343 [ ] (SCHIRNEKER H L); | [Y]DE3532088 (FORD AEROSPACE & COMMUNICATION [US]); | [A]US4691638 (MEYER DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US2832130 (HERBERT HARVEY) |