EP0327134 - Radiation image storage panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosoi, Yuichi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 798, Miyanodai Kasei-machi Ashigara-Kami-Gun Kanagawa / JP | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/32] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102044.8 | 06.02.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | JP19880026322 | 05.02.1988 Original published format: JP 2632288 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0327134 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0327134 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327134 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G21K4/00 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1989/32] | Title | German: | Schirm zum Speichern eines Strahlungsbildes | [1989/32] | English: | Radiation image storage panel | [1989/32] | French: | Ecran pour l'enregistrement d'une image obtenue par rayonnement | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0128592 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0133683 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP0253348 |