EP0330864 - Device for controlling the evaporation of fuel in motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adam Opel Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofsplatz 1 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states Adam Opel Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofsplatz 1 D-65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rühl, Werner Jürgen, Dr.-Ing. Dieburger Strasse 38 D-6070 Langen / DE | 02 /
Schwarz, Bernd, Dr.-Ing. Moritzstrasse 10 D-6500 Mainz 1 / DE | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Bergerin, Ralf, et al Adam Opel AG Patentwesen/80-34 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Bergerin, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Adam Opel AG Patentwesen D-65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102051.3 | 07.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | DE19883806252 | 27.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3806252 | [1989/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330864 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330864 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/02, F02M25/08 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
B60K15/03504 (EP);
F02M25/089 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kraftstoffverdampfungskontrolle von Fahrzeugen | [1989/36] | English: | Device for controlling the evaporation of fuel in motor vehicles | [1989/36] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de l'évaporation du carburant dans des véhicules | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/45] | 11.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.04.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4684382 ; | [Y]DE3122769 ; | [Y]US3730158 ; | [X]US3844739 ; | [X]US3477210 ; | [X]US4289513 ; | [A]US4381929 ; | [X]JPS62279125 ; | [AP]JPS63295848 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 160 (M-697) 14 Mai 1988& JP-A-62 279125 (TOYOTA) 04 Dezember 1987, | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 122 (M-807)(3470) 27 März 1989& JP-A-63 295848 (AISIN CHEM CO) 02 Dezember 1988, |