EP0328100 - High throughput communication method and system for a digital mobile station when crossing a zone boundary during a session [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/33] | High throughout communication method and system for a digital mobile station when crossing a zone boundary during a session | ||
[1995/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Toshimitsu c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sako, Yasuhiko c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102236.0 | 09.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | JP19880029066 | 10.02.1988 Original published format: JP 2906688 | JP19880029067 | 10.02.1988 Original published format: JP 2906788 | JP19880029068 | 10.02.1988 Original published format: JP 2906888 | JP19890019037 | 26.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1903789 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0328100 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0328100 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0328100 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20, H04B7/26, H04L12/56 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
H04W36/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/50] | H04Q7/04, H04B7/26, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [1989/33] | H04Q7/04, H04L11/20, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1989/33] | Title | German: | Kommunikationsverfahren und System mit hohem Durchsatz für eine digitale mobile Station beim Überfahren einer Zonengrenze während einer Verbindung | [1989/33] | English: | High throughput communication method and system for a digital mobile station when crossing a zone boundary during a session | [1995/25] | French: | Système et méthode de communication à haut débit pour station mobile numérique lors du changement de zone en cours de session | [1989/33] |
Former [1989/33] | High throughout communication method and system for a digital mobile station when crossing a zone boundary during a session | Examination procedure | 09.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/33] | 19.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55095438 ; | [A]WO8600775 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]US4587652 (GOLDMAN STUART O [US]); | [A]US4697281 (O'SULLIVAN HARRY M [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 145 (E-29)(627) 14 October 80, & JP-A-55 095438 (NEC) 19 July 80,, & JP55095438 A 00000000 |