EP0328129 - Yellow-colored solid matter and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1989/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makino, Tadashi 39-1, 12 Mishimaoka 2-chome Ibaraki Osaka 567 / JP | 02 /
Yamanaka, Minosuke 6-16, Miyayamacho 4-chome Toyonaka Osaka 560 / JP | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102320.2 | 10.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | JP19880031496 | 12.02.1988 Original published format: JP 3149688 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0328129 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0328129 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0328129 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09B61/00 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
C09B61/00 (EP);
A23L5/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | Gelb gefärbter fester Körper und seine Herstellung | [1989/33] | English: | Yellow-colored solid matter and production thereof | [1989/33] | French: | Matière solide colorée en jaune et sa production | [1989/33] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 17.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55111761 ; | [A]JP55111752 ; | [A]JP61225257 ; | [A]JP53052665 ; | [A]JP60243007 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 173 (C-32)[655], 29th November 1980; & JP-A-55 111 761 (SHIMADAYA HONTEN K.K.) 28-08-1980, & JP55111761 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 173 (C-32)[655], 29th November 1980; & JP-A-55 111 752 (TOYO INK SEYZO K.K.) 28-08-1980, & JP55111752 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 69 (C-407)[2516], 3rd March 1987; & JP-A-61 225 257 (SHISEIDO CO., LTD) 07-10-1986, & JP61225257 A 00000000 | [A] - WPI, FILE SUPPLIER, AN=78-44942A [25], Derwent Publications, Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-53 052 665 (M. MORI) 13-05-1978, & JP53052665 A 00000000 | [A] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, AN=86-018502 [3], Derwent Publications, Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-60 243 007 (KANEBO K.K.) 03-12-1985, & JP60243007 A 00000000 |