EP0331954 - Catheter-holding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Melsungen AG Postfach 120 34209 Melsungen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states B. Braun Melsungen AG Postfach 120 D-34209 Melsungen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haindl, Hans, Dr. Schoene Aussicht 4 D-3508 Melsungen / DE | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102862.3 | 18.02.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | DE19880002756U | 02.03.1988 Original published format: DE 8802756 U | [1989/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331954 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331954 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/02 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
A61M25/02 (EP,US);
A61M2025/024 (EP,US);
Y10S128/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/37] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Katheters | [1989/37] | English: | Catheter-holding device | [1989/37] | French: | Appareil pour fixer un cathéter | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 12.08.1992 | AT | 18.02.1993 | GB | 18.02.1993 | ES | 19.02.1993 | SE | 19.02.1993 | BE | 28.02.1993 | CH | 28.02.1993 | LI | 28.02.1993 | LU | 28.02.1993 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 12.08.1992 | |
AT | 18.02.1993 | ||
GB | 18.02.1993 | ||
SE | 19.02.1993 | ||
BE | 28.02.1993 | ||
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
LU | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 18.02.1993 | |
GB | 18.02.1993 | ||
SE | 19.02.1993 | ||
BE | 28.02.1993 | ||
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | GB | 18.02.1993 | |
SE | 19.02.1993 | ||
BE | 28.02.1993 | ||
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | GB | 18.02.1993 | |
SE | 19.02.1993 | ||
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | GB | 18.02.1993 | |
SE | 19.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | SE | 19.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4314568 (LOVING JAMES A); | [AD]DE8204827U ; | [A]US4632670 (MUELLER JR RICHARD L [US]); | [AD]EP0247571 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | Examination | DE7801811U |