EP0331965 - Blends of poly(arylene sulfides), organic carbonates, further thermoplasts and glassfibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehnert, Wolfgang, Dr. Bodelschwinghstrasse 14 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Reinking, Klaus, Dr. Robert-Stolz-Strasse 16 b D-5632 Wermelskirchen 1 / DE | 03 /
Tresper, Erhard, Dr. Moerser Strasse 394 D-4150 Krefeld 11 / DE | 04 /
Köhler, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Buschstrasse 165 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 05 /
Traenckner, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Wedelstrasse 46 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 06 /
Schmidt, Manfred, Dr. Erich-Klausener-Strasse 37 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | [1989/37] | Application number, filing date | 89102965.4 | 21.02.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | DE19883807231 | 05.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3807231 | DE19893901029 | 14.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3901029 | DE19893900260 | 06.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3900260 | [1989/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331965 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331965 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/40, C08K5/04, C08L81/02, // (C08L81/02, 69:00, 83:04) | [1989/37] | CPC: |
C08K7/14 (EP);
C08L81/02 (EP);
C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L83/04 (EP);
H05K1/0333 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K7/14, C08L81/02 (EP);
C08L81/02, C08L2666/18 (EP);
C08L81/02, C08L83/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/37] | Title | German: | Mischungen aus Polyarylensulfiden, organischen Carbonaten, weiteren Thermoplasten und Glasfasern | [1989/37] | English: | Blends of poly(arylene sulfides), organic carbonates, further thermoplasts and glassfibers | [1989/37] | French: | Mélanges de sulfures de polyarylène, de carbonates organiques, d'autres thermoplastes et de fibres de verre | [1989/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 20.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 30.09.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58025333 ; | [AP]JP63312356 ; | [X]EP0090922 ; | [XD]EP0104543 ; | [XD]US4021596 ; | [A]US4140671 ; | [A]US4708983 ; | [A]EP0246016 ; | [X]EP0087038 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 100 (C-164)[1245], 28. April 1983; & JP-A-58 025 333 (TORAY K.K.) 15-02-1983, & JP58025333 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 13, Nr. 156 (C-585)[3504], 14. April 1989; & JP-A-63 312 356 (UBE) 20-12-1987, & JP63312356 A 00000000 |