EP0331087 - Ultraviolet-curing coating composition and production process of molded plastic article having hardened coating of modified surface characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tayama, Suehiro 8-11, Misonodai Ohtake-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Taro 2-1, Kurokawa 3-chome Ohtake-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89103427.4 | 27.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | JP19880046377 | 29.02.1988 Original published format: JP 4637788 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331087 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331087 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09D3/80, C08F2/46, C08J7/04 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (KR);
C08J7/0427 (EP);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C09D175/02 (KR);
C08J2433/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F222/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/36] | Title | German: | UV-härtbare Überzugszusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Plastik-Formgegenständen mit Härteüberzug von modifierter Oberflächen-Charakteristik | [1989/36] | English: | Ultraviolet-curing coating composition and production process of molded plastic article having hardened coating of modified surface characteristics | [1989/36] | French: | Composition de revêtement durcissable par UV et procédé de préparation d'articles plastiques moulés avec revêtement dur et caractéristiques de surface modifiées | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 10.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/29] | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8000968 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [X]WO8705307 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]); | [XP]EP0274596 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [YD]EP0037978 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [Y]EP0100688 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [Y]EP0050996 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [Y]EP0077074 (DESOTO INC [US]); | [Y]EP0073413 (BASF AG [DE]) |