EP0384933 - Gas laser and method of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welsch, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Fuchsweg 25b D-8011 Baldham / DE | [1990/36] | Application number, filing date | 89103685.7 | 02.03.1989 | [1990/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0384933 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0384933 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/032 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
C04B37/025 (EP,US);
B23K1/18 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B37/04 (EP,US);
H01S3/0323 (EP,US);
C04B2237/04 (EP,US);
C04B2237/10 (EP,US);
C04B2237/32 (EP,US);
C04B2237/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/36] | H01S3/03 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/36] | Title | German: | Gaslaser und Herstellungsverfahren | [1990/36] | English: | Gas laser and method of producing same | [1990/36] | French: | Laser à gaz et procédé de fabrication | [1990/36] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2043169 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]FR2068011 (CILAS); | [Y]DE2506842 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]FR2450516 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0262352 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |