EP0332117 - Portable electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iijima, Yasuo c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89103927.3 | 06.03.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | JP19880055376 | 09.03.1988 Original published format: JP 5537688 | JP19880200017 | 12.08.1988 Original published format: JP 20001788 | [1989/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0332117 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0332117 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332117 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06K19/00 (KR);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/35765 (EP,US);
G07F7/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/37] | Title | German: | Tragbarer elektronischer Apparat | [1989/37] | English: | Portable electronic apparatus | [1989/37] | French: | Appareil électronique portatif | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/37] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2212603 (BURROUGHS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0089876 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [A]WO8707060 (SMART CARD APPLIC INC [US]); | [APD]US4734568 (WATANABE HIROSHI [JP]) |