EP0334100 - Full bridge switching circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hitchcock, Leonard J. Rd. 4, Box 254 Montrose Pennsylvania 18801 / US | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/48] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/12] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Elmar Ott, Dipl.-Ing. Peter Klocke, Dipl.-Phys. Hans-J. Neubauer, Kappelstrasse 8 D-72160 Horb / DE | ||
Former [1989/39] | Gaugel, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland GmbH Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104011.5 | 07.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | US19880171098 | 21.03.1988 Original published format: US 171098 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334100 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334100 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334100 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/5387, H03K17/687 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
H02M7/5387 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/39] | H02M7/537 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/39] | Title | German: | Vollbrückenschaltanordnung | [1989/39] | English: | Full bridge switching circuit | [1989/39] | French: | Circuit de commutation en pont complet | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4511815 (WOOD PETER N [US]); | [AD]US4626980 (MCGUIRE THOMAS B [US]) | [Y] - CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 1987 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS SOCIETY vol. 1, 18 October 1987, Georgia, US pages 734 - 741; A.R. PRASAD et al: "A high frequency off-line SMR converter with improved performance characteristics" | [AD] - APEC'88 THIRD ANNUAL IEEE APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE 1 February 1988, New Orleans, US pages 360 - 367; J. G. HAYES et al: "Zero-voltage switching in a constant frequency digitally controlled resonant DC-DC power converter" |