EP0341391 - Agent and device for the determination of an antigen or antibody [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/46] | Agent and device for the determination of antigen or antibody | ||
[1993/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Nisshin Oil Mills, Ltd. 23-1, 1-chome Shinkawa Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okahata, Yoshio 2-11, Nijigaoka 1-chome Aso-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Naofumi 5-8, Sagamihara 5-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Sada, Takuro 69 Nakakibogaoka Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104257.4 | 10.03.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | JP19880057628 | 11.03.1988 Original published format: JP 5762888 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341391 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341391 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/58 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/5432 (EP,US);
G01N33/5436 (EP,US);
G01N33/586 (EP,US);
Y10S436/80 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US);
Y10S436/807 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Agens und Gerät zur Bestimmung von Antigenen oder Antikörpern | [1989/46] | English: | Agent and device for the determination of an antigen or antibody | [1993/26] | French: | Agent et dispositif de détermination d'antigènes ou d'anticorps | [1989/46] |
Former [1989/46] | Agent and device for the determination of antigen or antibody | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 27.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DD218734 ; | [Y]US4322311 (LIM FRANKLIN, et al); | [X]EP0001223 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]EP0199362 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, 1985, page 45, abstract no. 161469v, Columbus, Ohio, US; & DD-A-218 734 (AKADEMIE DER WISSENSCHAFTEN DER DDR) 13-02-1985, & DD218734 A 00000000 |