EP0340422 - Apparatus for dissolving concretions in a body cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richard Wolf GmbH Pforzheimer Strasse 32 75438 Knittlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states Richard Wolf GmbH Pforzheimer Strasse 32 D-75438 Knittlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wurster, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Mozartstrasse 20 D-7519 Oberderdingen / DE | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Wilcken, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Wilcken, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann Musterbahn 1 D-23552 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104285.5 | 10.03.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | DE19883814743 | 30.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3814743 | [1989/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0340422 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0340422 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
A61B17/225 (EP,US);
A61B17/22004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22008 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1989/45] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Auflösung von Konkrementen in einer Körperhöhle | [1989/45] | English: | Apparatus for dissolving concretions in a body cavity | [1989/45] | French: | Appareil pour faire dissoudre les concrétions dans une cavité du corps | [1989/45] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3614069 (MURRY EDWARD J); | [Y]US4483345 (MIWA HIROHIDE [JP]); | [A]EP0148653 (DORY JACQUES); | [XP]EP0282727 (DORNIER MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) | [Y] - DIGESTION, Band 34, 1986, Seiten 51-59, Karger AG, Basel, CH; M. NEUBRAND et al.: "In vitro cholesterol gallstone dissolution after fragmentation with shock waves" | [A] - ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, Band 13, Nr. 2, Februar 1987, Seiten 69-76, Pergamon Journals Ltd, Oxford, GB; A.J. COLEMAN et al.: "Acoustic cavitation generated by an extracorporeal shockwave lithotripter" | [A] - ULTRASONICS, Band 8, Nr. 2, April 1970, Seiten 112-123; G. BRADFIELD: "Ultrasonic transducers. 1. Introduction to ultrasonic transducers. Part A" | [A] - ULTRASONICS, Band 3, Nr. 3, July-September 1965, Seiten 115-127; T. TARNOCZY: "Sound focussing lenses and waveguides" |