EP0332209 - Tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AL-KO Kober AG Ichenhauser Strasse 14 D-89359 Kötz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states AL-KO KOBER AG Ichenhauser Strasse 14 D-89359 Kötz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iffländer, Wolfgang J.F. Kiebitzbrink 79a D-2800 Bremen 33 / DE | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, et al Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schwibbogenplatz 2b D-86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104293.9 | 10.03.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | DE19880003245U | 10.03.1988 Original published format: DE 8803245 U | [1989/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0332209 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332209 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/00 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
E04B1/5837 (EP);
F16B7/042 (EP);
E04B2001/5856 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/37] | Title | German: | Rohr | [1989/37] | English: | Tube | [1989/37] | French: | Tube | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 09.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3526729 [ ] (HUEPPE GMBH [DE]); | DE958701 [ ] (HILGERS AG); | DE2725921 [ ] (ADOLFF EMIL FA); | [A]CH405961 (FICKLER HANS [CH]) |