EP0333138 - Blind fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | ||
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states The B.F. Goodrich Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips, Ronald Wayne II 585 Manning Road Mogadore Ohio 44260 / US | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1989/38] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104524.7 | 14.03.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | US19880169532 | 17.03.1988 Original published format: US 169532 | [1989/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0333138 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0333138 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/10, F16B29/00, F16B37/06 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
F16B19/1054 (EP,US);
F16B19/1072 (EP,US);
F16B29/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/38] | F16B19/10 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/38] | Title | German: | Blindbefestiger | [1989/38] | English: | Blind fastener | [1989/38] | French: | Dispositif de fixation aveugle | [1989/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 17.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1881973 (ALFRED SCHMITT); | [Y]FR2073978 (SHUR LOK CORP); | [A]FR2290600 (OTALU [FR]); | [Y]US4036098 (SCHRUFF HERBERT) |