EP0334182 - Watch case provided with a cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | [1992/46] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Grenchen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosjean, Laurent Petit-Pontarlier 3 CH-2006 Neuchâtel / CH | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 89104561.9 | 15.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | CH19880001096 | 23.03.1988 Original published format: CH 109688 | [1989/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0334182 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334182 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G04B39/02, G04B47/04, G04B37/22 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
G04B47/042 (EP,US);
G04B37/00 (KR);
G04B37/226 (EP,US);
G04B39/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL, SE [1989/39] | Title | German: | Uhrengehäuse mit einem Mantel | [1989/39] | English: | Watch case provided with a cap | [1989/39] | French: | Boîte de montre munie d'une coiffe | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/19] | 20.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH650894 ; | [A]CH97271 (HENRI JEANNERET [CH]); | [A]US1591512 (CHAIKEN IRVING H); | [X]FR909573 ; | [X]CH262326 (COLOMB HENRI [CH]); | [A]DE2753447 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) | Examination | GB102641 | DE1099773 | CH352966 |