EP0334240 - Semiconductor integrated circuit device having a microprogramm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniai, Takayoshi 1339, Shimosakunobe Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 213 / JP | 02 /
Nagasawa, Tatsuya 1-1-2, Kanumadai Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa, 229 / JP | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Seeger, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. SEEGER & SEEGER Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104851.4 | 17.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | JP19880071426 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7142688 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334240 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334240 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334240 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/26 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
G06F9/268 (EP,US);
G06F11/28 (KR);
G06F9/26 (EP,US);
H01L27/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/39] | G06F9/22 | Designated contracting states | FR [1995/36] |
Former [1989/39] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Integrierte Halbleiterschaltungsanordnung mit Mikroprogramm | [1989/39] | English: | Semiconductor integrated circuit device having a microprogramm | [1989/39] | French: | Dispositif de circuit intégré à semi-conducteur avec microprogramme | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4275441 (TAKEUCHI HIROSHI); | [A]US4677586 (MAGAR SURENDAR S [US], et al) | [A] - 18TH ANNUAL WORKSHOP ON MICROPROGRAMMING, Pacific Grove, CA, 3rd - 6th December 1985, pages 35-46, IEEE, New York, US; F.J. BURKOWSKI: "An interactive diagnostic/debugging subsystem for bit-slice processors" | [A] - E.D.N. ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, vol. 32, no. 7, 31st March 1987, pages 191-196, Newton, MA, US; B. RICHARDSON: "Microprogram monitor helps develop bit-slice designs" |