EP0339256 - Preparation of linear polycarbonates from cyclic oligomer compositions using metal chelate catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stewart, Kevin Randall 68 Denison Road Schenectady New York 12309 / US | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89105020.5 | 21.03.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | US19880185596 | 25.04.1988 Original published format: US 185596 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339256 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339256 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/62 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
C08G64/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/44] | Title | German: | Herstellung von linearen Polycarbonaten aus cyclischen Oligomer-Zusammensetzungen in Gegenwart von Metallchelat-Katalysatoren | [1989/44] | English: | Preparation of linear polycarbonates from cyclic oligomer compositions using metal chelate catalyst | [1989/44] | French: | Préparation de polycarbonates linéaires à partir de compositions d'oligomères cycliques en présence d'un catalyseur d'un chélate de métal | [1989/44] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 01.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/16] | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3274214 (PROCHASKA ROBERT J); | [A]US4105641 (BUYSCH HANS-JOSEF, et al); | [A]US2878236 (YOUNG DONALD M, et al); | [A]FR1235867 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) |