EP0334322 - Slipping layer containing amino-modified siloxane and organic lubricating particles for dye-donor element used in thermal dye transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanier, Noel Rawle c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105139.3 | 22.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | US19880173345 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: US 173345 | US19880273380 | 18.11.1988 Original published format: US 273380 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0334322 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334322 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
B41M5/26 (US);
B41M5/30 (US);
B41M5/382 (US);
B41M5/395 (EP,US);
B41M5/40 (US);
B41M2205/02 (EP);
B41M2205/30 (EP);
B41M2205/36 (EP);
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B41M5/443 (EP,US);
B41M5/446 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/39] | Title | German: | Gleitschicht mit einem Gehalt an aminomodifiziertem Siloxan und organischen Gleitmittelpartikeln für ein Farbstoff-Donorelement zur Verwendung bei der Wärme-Farbstoffübertragung | [1989/39] | English: | Slipping layer containing amino-modified siloxane and organic lubricating particles for dye-donor element used in thermal dye transfer | [1989/39] | French: | Couche de glissement contenant un siloxane modifié par des amines et particules organiques lubrifiantes pour un élément donneur de colorant utilisé pour le transfert de colorant par la chaleur | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 29.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.03.1992 | [1993/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4753921 (HENZEL RICHARD P [US]); | [A]EP0138483 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]EP0163145 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [YP]EP0295484 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [YP]EP0295485 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |