EP0344424 - Fastener locking by rotation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/49] | Quarter turn fastener | ||
[1990/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMLOC GmbH Industriestrasse 6 D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | [1989/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hempel, Werner KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Stölken, Jochen KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1993/50] |
Former [1989/49] | 01 /
Hempel, Werner KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | ||
02 /
Stölken, Jochen KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | Representative(s) | Keil, Rainer A., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN, Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Keil, Rainer A., Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105411.6 | 28.03.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | DE19883814940 | 03.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3814940 | [1989/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0344424 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0344424 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344424 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/02, F16B5/00, B23P19/08, B25B27/02 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
F16B21/02 (EP);
B23P19/08 (EP);
B25B27/02 (EP);
F16B13/061 (EP);
F16B21/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/49] | Title | German: | Drehverschluss | [1989/49] | English: | Fastener locking by rotation | [1990/06] | French: | Attache verrouillante par rotation | [1990/06] |
Former [1989/49] | Quarter turn fastener | ||
Former [1989/49] | Attacke à quart de tour | Examination procedure | 13.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 18.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Request for further processing for: | 05.12.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.12.1993 | IT | 15.12.1993 | NL | 15.12.1993 | AT | 28.03.1994 | CH | 31.03.1994 | LI | 31.03.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 15.12.1993 | |
IT | 15.12.1993 | ||
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
AT | 28.03.1994 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 15.12.1993 | |
NL | 15.12.1993 | ||
AT | 28.03.1994 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/40] | NL | 15.12.1993 | |
AT | 28.03.1994 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | NL | 15.12.1993 | |
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 15.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | US2904288 [ ] (OTTO KRAUSS, et al); | US3675531 [ ] (LEHMAN KENNETH G); | US3995360 [ ] (MILLHEISER MELVIN); | [XP]DE8805835U | Examination | - Industrial Fasteners Handbook, 3rd Ed., The Trade & Technical Press Ltd., 1985, S. 361 bis 364 |