EP0336296 - Room temperature curing resin compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amano, Hisao 35-1, Ohkubo 3-chome Kohnan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Otsuki, Yutaka 332-4, Noba-cho Kohnan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ohshima, Akio 20-17, Rokkakubashi 6-chome Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105618.6 | 30.03.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | JP19880081221 | 04.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8122188 | [1989/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0336296 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0336296 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L13/00, C08L91/00 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
C08L91/005 (EP);
C08C19/28 (EP);
C08K5/053 (EP);
C08L13/00 (EP);
C08K5/01 (EP);
C08L19/006 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/053, C08L13/00 (EP);
C08L13/00, C08L2666/08 (EP);
C08L13/00, C08L2666/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/41] | Title | German: | Harz, härtbar bei Raumtemperatur | [1989/41] | English: | Room temperature curing resin compound | [1989/41] | French: | Résine durcissant à température ambiante | [1989/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 06.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/51] | 20.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0181441 ; | [X]EP0023084 ; | [X]EP0048128 ; | [X]US4145321 |