EP0338383 - Pharmaceutical preparation to be administered orally with controlled release of active substance and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHWARZ PHARMA AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states SCHWARZ PHARMA AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 D-40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states SCHWARZ PHARMA AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 D-40789 Monheim/Rhld. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klokkers-Bethke, Karin, Dr.rer.nat. Grazer Strasse 17 D-4019 Monheim/Rhld / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Wilfried, Dr.rer.nat. Anemonenweg 16 D-5093 Burscheid / DE | [1989/43] | Application number, filing date | 89106384.4 | 11.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | DE19883812799 | 16.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3812799 | [1989/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0338383 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0338383 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338383 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/54, A61K9/24 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/5078 (EP);
A61K9/5084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/43] | Title | German: | Oral zu verabreichende pharmazeutische Zubereitung mit kontrollierter Wirkstofffreisetzung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1989/43] | English: | Pharmaceutical preparation to be administered orally with controlled release of active substance and method for its manufacture | [1989/43] | French: | Préparation pharmaceutique pour administration orale à libération contrôlée du principe actif et son procédé de fabrication | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/43] | 17.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/16] | LU | 24.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0032562 (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]); | [AD]EP0040590 (HAESSLE AB [SE]); | [A]EP0092060 (PROPHIN LAB SPA [IT]) |