EP0392043 - Continuous casting machine with an oxygen flame cutting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FA. HORST K. LOTZ Robert-Bosch-Strasse 3 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | [1990/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lotz, Horst K. Fasanenweg 7 D-6240 Königstein-Johanniswald / DE | 02 /
Lotz, Tobias Kiefernweg 13 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Delkenheim / DE | 03 /
Lotz, Mattias Kiefernweg 13 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Delkenheim / DE | 04 /
Thoma, Günther K. Landsberger Strasse 17 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Delkenheim / DE | [1990/42] | Application number, filing date | 89106458.6 | 12.04.1989 | [1990/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0392043 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392043 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/126, B23K7/00 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
B23K7/00 (EP);
B22D11/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1991/08] |
Former [1990/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Stranggiessanlage mit Einrichtung zum Sauerstoffbrennschneiden | [1990/42] | English: | Continuous casting machine with an oxygen flame cutting apparatus | [1990/42] | French: | Machine de coulée avec dispositif de coupage au chalumeau à oxygène | [1990/42] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, ES, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | 16.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.07.1990 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   23.06.1990 | 31.07.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.1990 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   23.06.1990 | 31.07.1990 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.06.1990 | 31.07.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.06.1990 | 31.07.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.1990 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1990 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.07.1990 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.08.1994 | GB | 10.08.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/37] | GB | 10.08.1994 | |
FR | 06.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/34] | FR | 06.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2511591 (KELLER ARTHUR M); | [A]US3230117 (GUNTER BUDDENHAGEN); | [A]DE2327523 (SCHOEFFMANN RUDOLF DIPL ING); | [A]DE2631995 (ESAB KEBE GMBH); | [A]FR2462219 (FIVES CAIL BABCOCK [FR]); | [A]US4261552 (KAMEYAMA KAZUHIDE, et al); | [A]DE3005004 (IPU LTD [BS]); | [A]DE3103402 (IPU LTD [BS]); | [A]DE8501244U ; | [A]DE3532010 (AUTE AUTOGENE TECH [CH]); | [A]DE3541134 (AUTE AUTOGENE TECH [CH]) |