EP0339422 - 3-Cyano-4-phenyl-pyrrole derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wollweber, Detlef, Dr. Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 17 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Brandes, Wilhelm, Dr. Eichendorffstrasse 3 D-5653 Leichlingen / DE | 03 /
Dutzmann, Stefan, Dr. Leinenweberweg 33 D-4000 Düssseldorf 13 / DE | [1989/44] | Application number, filing date | 89106825.6 | 17.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | DE19883814479 | 29.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3814479 | [1989/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0339422 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339422 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/34, A01N43/36 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
C07D207/337 (KR);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
A01N47/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/44] | Title | German: | 3-Cyano-4-phenyl-pyrrol-Derivate | [1989/44] | English: | 3-Cyano-4-phenyl-pyrrole derivatives | [1989/44] | French: | Dérivés du 3-cyano-4-phényl-pyrrole | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 16.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1587652 ; | [YD]DE2927480 (NIPPON SODA CO) | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 95, Nr. 21, Seite 637, Zusammenfassung-Nr. 187 069f |