EP0341457 - Process for producing a smooth and glossy paper web, and calander therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Gladbacher Strasse 457 47805 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Gladbacher Strasse 457 D-47805 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brendel, Bernhard, Dr. Grasheider Strasse 32 D-4155 Grefrath 2 / DE | 02 /
Kubik, Klaus Homberger Strasse 14 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Palgen, Peter Patentanwälte P. Palgen & H. Schumacher Mulvanystrasse 2 40239 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Palgen, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Peter Palgen, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. H. Schumacher, Mulvanystrasse 2 D-40239 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106932.0 | 18.04.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | DE19883815463 | 06.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3815463 | [1989/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341457 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341457 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/00 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
D21G1/0093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Glätte und Glanz auf einer Papierbahn und entsprechende Kalanderanordnung | [1989/46] | English: | Process for producing a smooth and glossy paper web, and calander therefor | [1989/46] | French: | Procédé pour produire une bande de papier lisse et brillant, et calandre pour l'application du procédé | [1989/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/35] | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.05.1989 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   08.06.1989 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1804515 (KLEINEWEFERS SOEHNE J); | [A]US3841963 (SCHLUNKE J); | [X]FR2325764 (VOITH GMBH [DE]); | [X]DE3542342 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]); | [A]DE3600033 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]); | [AP]EP0296044 (MEASUREX CORP [US]) |