EP0339620 - Method for making stop cross tapes on slide fasteners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/44] | Method for making stop cross tapes on side fasteners | ||
[1993/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYNAT Gesellschaft für Verschlusstechnik und Feinmechanik mbH Bergmühlenstrasse 10 D-31137 Hildesheim / DE | [1989/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knolle, Hans-Hermann Willi-Plappert-Strasse 9 D-3200 Hildesheim / DE | 02 /
Neugebauer, Horst Gotthart Pankratiusstrasse 12 D-3208 Giesen / DE | [1989/44] | Application number, filing date | 89107578.0 | 26.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | DE19883814418 | 28.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3814418 | [1989/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0339620 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339620 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/32, A44B19/36, A44B19/60 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
A44B19/32 (EP);
A44B19/36 (EP);
A44B19/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Querzugriegeln an Reissverschlüssen | [1989/44] | English: | Method for making stop cross tapes on slide fasteners | [1993/11] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer des pattes transversales d'arrêt sur des fermetures à glissière | [1989/44] |
Former [1989/44] | Method for making stop cross tapes on side fasteners | Examination procedure | 08.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/05] | 21.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1991943 (KEVICZKY LASZLO V); | [A]US2267119 (DAVIS MARINSKY); | [A]GB607586 (GOODRICH CO B F); | [A]US2532724 (KRUPP CARROLL P); | [A]US2571072 (SOAVE JOHN G); | [A]FR1220935 (SECO); | [A]FR1353062 (WETZELL GUMMIWERKE AG); | [A]EP0128100 (NORMANDE CONFECTION [FR]) |