EP0339623 - Laser magnetic immunoassay method and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/44] | Laser magnetic immunoassay method and apparatus therefor and superparamagnetic material-labeled body and method for the manufacture of same | ||
[1993/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Koichi 13-15, Futabadai 2-chome Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Mizutani, Hiroko 11-1307, Udagawa-cho 6 Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mizutani, Hiromichi deceased / JP | 04 /
Shibata, Shuichi 12-14, Joto 1-chome Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Arishima, Koichi 231-2, Miwa 2-chome Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 06 /
Hoshino, Mitsutoshi 12-45, Yoshizawa-cho Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 07 /
Hoshino, Yasushi 3-2-3, Maborikaigan Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/13] |
Former [1989/44] | 01 /
Fujiwara, Koichi 13-15, Futabadai 2-chome Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Mizutani, Hiroko 11-1307, Udagawa-cho 6 Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Mizutani, Hiromichi deceased / JP | |||
04 /
Sibata, Shuichi 12-14, Joto 1-chome Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Arishima, Koichi 231-2, Miwa 2-chome Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Hoshino, Mitsutoshi 12-45, Yoshizawa-cho Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Hoshino, Yasushi 3-2-3, Maborikaigan Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89107588.9 | 26.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | JP19880102914 | 26.04.1988 Original published format: JP 10291488 | JP19890101311 | 20.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10131189 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0339623 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339623 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/553, G01N33/543, G01N33/58 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/54326 (EP);
G01N33/585 (EP);
G01N35/0098 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Lasermagnetisches Immuntestverfahren und Gerät dazu | [1993/50] | English: | Laser magnetic immunoassay method and apparatus therefor | [1993/50] | French: | Méthode d'essai immunologique laser-magnétique et appareil à cet effet | [1993/50] |
Former [1989/44] | Lasermagnetisches Immuntestverfahren und Gerät dazu und mit superparamagnetischem Material markierter Körper und Verfahren zur Herstellung davon | ||
Former [1989/44] | Laser magnetic immunoassay method and apparatus therefor and superparamagnetic material-labeled body and method for the manufacture of same | ||
Former [1989/44] | Méthode d'essai immunologique laser-magnétique et appareil à cet effet et corps marqués avec un matériel super-paramagnétique et méthode de fabrication à cet effet | Examination procedure | 20.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 06.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDL]EP0287665 ; | [X]EP0125995 ; | [X]WO8702063 | [XD] - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, vol. 52, 1982, pages 353-367, Elsevier Biomedical Press, Amsterdam, NL; R.S. MOLDAY et al.: "Immunospecific ferromagnetic iron-dextran reagents for the labeling and magnetic separation of cells" | Examination | US4770183 |