EP0340679 - Retaining device for one or several elongate articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hellermann GmbH Siemensstrasse 5 25421 Pinneberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states Paul Hellermann GmbH Siemensstrasse 5 D-25421 Pinneberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köster, Lothar, Dr.-Ing. Bei den Düneneichen 16 D-2050 Hamburg 80 / DE | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/45] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89107800.8 | 28.04.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | DE19880005815U | 02.05.1988 Original published format: DE 8805815 U | [1989/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0340679 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0340679 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/12, F16L3/22 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
F16L3/22 (EP);
F16L3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/45] | Title | German: | Halter für einen oder mehrere langgestreckte Gegenstände | [1989/45] | English: | Retaining device for one or several elongate articles | [1989/45] | French: | Elément de fixation pour un ou plusieurs objets allongés | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 25.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2183287 (TRW CARR FRANCE SA); | [X]US3980263 (OKUDA SEIZI); | [AD]FR2324920 (TUREK WERNER [DE]) |