EP0393230 - Functionalized fluoropolyethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUSIMONT S.p.A. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20100 Milano / IT | [1995/39] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states AUSIMONT S.r.l. Foro Buonaparte, 31 I-20100 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchionni, Giuseppe, Dr. 8, via Vallisneri I-20133 Milan / IT | 02 /
Gavezotti, Piero, Dr. 9, via Camibue I-20148 Milan / IT | 03 /
Strepparola, Ezio, Dr. 6, viale Partigiano I-20047 Treviglio Bergamo / IT | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/43] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89107956.8 | 02.05.1989 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | IT19890047869 | 20.04.1989 Original published format: IT 4786989 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0393230 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0393230 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393230 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/00 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
C08G65/329 (EP,US);
C08G65/00 (KR);
C08G65/007 (EP,US);
C08G65/226 (EP,US);
C08G65/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | Funktionalisierte Fluoropolyether | [1990/43] | English: | Functionalized fluoropolyethers | [1990/43] | French: | Polyéthers fluorés fonctionalisés | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT307052B (DOW CORNING [US]); | [A]EP0151877 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]EP0195946 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]); | [X]EP0259980 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]DE3739447 (NIPPON MEKTRON KK [JP]) |