EP0340766 - Compensation method for noise voltage from the electrode circuit of a magneto-inductive flow meter and for offset voltage originating from the amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer & Porter GmbH Postfach 1843 Dransfelder Strasse 2 D-37079 Göttingen / DE | [1989/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchewka, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Rosenwinkel 4 D-3433 Neu-Eichenberg / DE | 02 /
Rackebrandt, Karl-Heinz, Dipl. Ing. An der Reitbahn 6 D-3404 Adelebsen / DE | 03 /
Schäfer, Klaus, Dipl.- Ing. Lug ins Land 26 D-3510 Hann-Münden / DE | 04 /
Seebode, Albert Sellenfried 21 D-3405 Rosdorf 1 / DE | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Fincke, Karl Theodor, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108051.7 | 03.05.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | DE19883815190 | 04.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3815190 | [1989/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0340766 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0340766 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0340766 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/60, G01F1/58, G01F1/56 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/45] | G01F1/56, G01F1/60 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1989/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kompensation vom im Elektrodenkreis einer magnetisch-induktiven Durchflussmesser-Anordnung auftretenden Störspannungen sowie Offset-Spannungen von dem Elektrodenkreis nachgeschalteten Verstärkerstufen | [1989/45] | English: | Compensation method for noise voltage from the electrode circuit of a magneto-inductive flow meter and for offset voltage originating from the amplifier | [1989/45] | French: | Méthode de compensation pour les tensions de bruit apparaissant dans le circuit des électrodes d'un débitmètre à base induction magnétique et des tensions offset provenant de l'amplificateur intercalé à la suite dudit circuit | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH634408 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]); | [AD]CH655794 (FLOWTEC AG); | [A]DE3537752 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) |