EP0351508 - Method for automatically matching an X-ray diagnostic generator with the mains resistance, and the X-ray diagnostic generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-8000 München 2 / DE | ||
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states TRANSFORMATOREN- UND ROENTGENWERK GmbH Overbeckstrasse 48 O-8030 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states VEB Transformatoren- und Röntgenwerk "Hermann Matern" Overbeckstrasse 48 DDR-8030 Dresden / DD | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sackmann, Otto Nachtflügelweg 12 DDR-8051 Dresden / DD | 02 /
Reuther, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Elsasser Strasse 7 DDR-8019 Dresden / DD | 03 /
Heyne, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Scharfenberger Strasse 40 DDR-8030 Dresden / DD | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/38] |
Former [1990/04] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108298.4 | 09.05.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | DD19530003180 | 19.07.1988 Original published format: DD 318053 | DD19540003180 | 19.07.1988 Original published format: DD 318054 | [1990/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351508 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351508 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05G1/26, H05G1/46 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
H05G1/26 (EP);
H05G1/10 (EP);
H05G1/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur selbsttätigen Anpassung eines Röntgendiagnostikgenerators an den Speisenetzwiderstand und Röntgendiagnostikgenerator | [1990/04] | English: | Method for automatically matching an X-ray diagnostic generator with the mains resistance, and the X-ray diagnostic generator | [1990/04] | French: | Procédé d'ajustage automatique d'un générateur de radiodiagnostic à la résistance du réseau d'alimentation et générateur de radiodiagnostic | [1990/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57132700 ; | [A]DE2756869 ; | [A]FR2134403 ; | [A]DE3610438 ; | [XP]US4811374 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 230 (E-142)[1108], 16. November 1982; & JP-A-57 132 700 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 17-08-1982, & JP57132700 A 00000000 |