EP0341715 - Thermosensitive recording materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS, LTD. 4-2, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS, LTD. 4-2, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Atsuo Tsukuba Hausu 405 16-2, Higashiarai Tsukuba-shi / JP | 02 /
Koike, Naomasa Tsukuba Hausu 402 16-2, Higashiarai Tsukuba-shi / JP | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108491.5 | 11.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | JP19880116052 | 12.05.1988 Original published format: JP 11605288 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341715 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341715 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341715 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/426 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/46] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliche Aufzeichnungsmaterialien | [1989/46] | English: | Thermosensitive recording materials | [1989/46] | French: | Matériaux pour l'enregistrement thermosensible | [1989/46] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 21.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1993
07.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Sternagel, Hans-Günther Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02
19.10.1993
03.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Papierfabrik August Koehler AG Hauptstrasse 2-4 Postfach 1245 D-77704 Oberkirch / DE Opponent's representative Hagemann, Heinrich Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | 03
19.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Rohm and Haas Company Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19105 / US Opponent's representative Angell, David Whilton ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | 04
20.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, 1-chome, Nakamagome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143 / JP Opponent's representative Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1993
07.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02
19.10.1993
03.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Papierfabrik August Koehler AG Hauptstrasse 2-4 Postfach 1245 D-77704 Oberkirch / DE Opponent's representative Hagemann, Heinrich Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | |||
03
19.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Rohm and Haas Company Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19105 / US Opponent's representative Angell, David Whilton ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, Surrey, CR9 3NB / GB | |||
04
20.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, 1-chome, Nakamagome Ohta-ku / JP Opponent's representative Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 D-80803 München / DE | |||
Former [1995/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1993
07.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02
19.10.1993
03.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Papierfabrik August Koehler AG Hauptstrasse 2-4 Postfach 1245 D-77704 Oberkirch / DE Opponent's representative Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte HAGEMANN & KEHL Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | |||
03
19.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Rohm and Haas Company Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19105 / US Opponent's representative Angell, David Whilton ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, Surrey, CR9 3NB / GB | |||
04
20.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, 1-chome, Nakamagome Ohta-ku / JP Opponent's representative Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 D-80803 München / DE | |||
Former [1995/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1993
07.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE | ||
02
19.10.1993
03.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Papierfabrik August Koehler AG Hauptstrasse 2-4 Postfach 1245 D-77704 Oberkirch / DE Opponent's representative Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte HAGEMANN & KEHL Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | |||
03
19.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Rohm and Haas Company Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19105 / US Opponent's representative Angell, David Whilton ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, Surrey, CR9 3NB / GB | |||
04
20.10.1993
02.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, 1-chome, Nakamagome Ohta-ku / JP Opponent's representative Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 D-80803 München / DE | |||
Former [1993/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1993
Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE | ||
02
19.10.1993
Papierfabrik August Koehler AG Hauptstrasse 2-4 Postfach 1245 D-77704 Oberkirch / DE Opponent's representative Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte HAGEMANN & KEHL Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | |||
03
19.10.1993
Rohm and Haas Company Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19105 / US Opponent's representative Angell, David Whilton ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, Surrey, CR9 3NB / GB | |||
04
20.10.1993
Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, 1-chome, Nakamagome Ohta-ku / JP Opponent's representative Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | |||
Former [1993/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1993
Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE | ||
02
19.10.1993
Papierfabrik August Koehler AG Hauptstrasse 2-4 Postfach 1245 D-77704 Oberkirch / DE Opponent's representative Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte HAGEMANN & KEHL Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | |||
03
19.10.1993
ADMISSIBLE Rohm and Haas Company Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19105 / US Opponent's representative Angell, David Whilton ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, Surrey, CR9 3NB / GB | |||
Former [1993/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1993
Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE | 01.12.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.11.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.01.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61229589 ; | [X]JP62117787 ; | [X]JP62179985 ; | [Y]EP0186375 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0291315 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 74 (M-568)[2521], 6th March 1987; & JP-A-61 229 589 (RICOH CO., LTD) 13-10-1986, & JP61229589 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 336 (M-638)[2783], 4th November 1987; & JP-A-62 117 787 (RICOH CO., LTD) 29-05-1987, & JP62117787 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 21 (M-661)[2868], 22nd January 1988; & JP-A-62 179 985 (OJI PAPER CO., LTD) 07-08-1987, & JP62179985 A 00000000 |