EP0352419 - Electric brake device for a centrifuge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK BERTHOLD HERMLE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Industriestrasse 8-12 D-78559 Gosheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK BERTHOLD HERMLE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Industriestrasse 8-12 D-78559 Gosheim / DE | ||
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states BERTHOLD HERMLE GMBH & CO. Industriestrasse 8-12 D-7209 Gosheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermle, Harald Griesweg 12 D-7201 Mahlstetten / DE | 02 /
Ulber, Hans Christoph Sommerrainstrasse 54 D-7209 Wehingen / DE | [1990/05] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Hans, et al Patentanwälte, Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel, Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwalte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Otto Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans Vetter Hölderlinweg 58 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108579.7 | 12.05.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | DE19883825835 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3825835 | [1990/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0352419 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0352419 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02P3/12, B04B9/10 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
B04B9/10 (EP);
H02P3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/05] | Title | German: | Elektrische Bremsvorrichtung für eine Zentrifuge | [1990/05] | English: | Electric brake device for a centrifuge | [1990/05] | French: | Appareil électrique de freinage pour machine centrifuge | [1990/05] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/26] | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2133233 ; | [A]DE2824045 ; | [A]DE1067511 |