EP0342567 - Method for producing plastic sheets with a scratch-resistant coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states RÖHM GMBH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vetter, Heinz, Dr. Ing Taunusstrasse 92 D-6101 Rossdorf / DE | 02 /
Siol, Werner, Dr. Goerdelerweg 34 D-6100 Darmstadt-Eberstadt / DE | [1989/47] | Application number, filing date | 89108692.8 | 13.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | DE19883816855 | 18.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3816855 | [1989/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342567 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342567 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/30 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
B05C1/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B29C37/0025 (EP,US);
B29C43/305 (EP,US);
B32B37/24 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B32B2307/584 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung kratzfest beschichteter Kunststoffbahnen | [1989/47] | English: | Method for producing plastic sheets with a scratch-resistant coating | [1989/47] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de feuilles en matière plastique revêtues d'une couche résistante à l'abrasion | [1989/47] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/43] | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.07.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3032815 (HEINZ GERBER KARL); | [A]FR2252197 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [X]DE2541784 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [X]EP0171549 (SCHMALKALDEN SPORT VEB [DD]); | [XP]EP0313979 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) |