EP0342584 - Device for moving liquid, pasty and/or granular mediums [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doman, Michael, Dr. Postfach 22 13 D-23510 Lübeck / DE | [1989/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/47] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108749.6 | 16.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | DE19883816654 | 16.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3816654 | [1989/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0342584 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342584 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01F11/00, F16H21/46 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
F16H21/46 (EP,US);
B01F31/70 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18856 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bewegen von flüssigen, pastösen und/oder schüttfähigen Medien | [1989/47] | English: | Device for moving liquid, pasty and/or granular mediums | [1989/47] | French: | Dispositif pour agiter des milieux de type liquide, pâteux et/ou granuleux | [1989/47] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE589452 (SCHATZ PAUL); | [A]US2302804 (PAUL SCHATZ); | [A]DE1507896 (KRAUSE DIPL ING HELMUT); | [A]CH586066 (SCHATZ PAUL); | [A]DE2941421 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) |