EP0346633 - Base plate for fastening a hinge arm of a furniture or similar hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arturo Salice S.p.A. Via Provinciale Novedratese 10 22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states Arturo Salice S.p.A. Via Provinciale Novedratese 10 I-22060 Novedrate (Como) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/51] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89108877.5 | 17.05.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | DE19883820389 | 15.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3820389 | [1989/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346633 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346633 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/04, E05D5/02 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
E05D7/0407 (EP);
E05D5/0276 (EP);
E05Y2900/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/51] | Title | German: | Grundplatte zur Befestigung eines Scharnierarms eines Möbelscharniers o.dgl. | [1989/51] | English: | Base plate for fastening a hinge arm of a furniture or similar hinge | [1989/51] | French: | Plaque de base pour la fixation d'un bras de charnière d'une charnière pour meubles ou similaires | [1989/51] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 14.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2657628 (HEINZE RICHARD); | [Y]EP0043903 (SALICE ARTURO SPA); | [A]AT369101B (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]); | [A]DE3501048 (LAUTENSCHLAEGER KG KARL [DE]); | [YD]DE3605902 (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0255692 (SALICE ARTURO SPA); | [A]EP0168731 |