EP0347582 - Injection pump for internal-combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.01.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pischinger, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Prof. Dr. Amschlgasse 29 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Stipek, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Gamperstrasse 15 A-5400 Hallein / AT | [1989/52] | Application number, filing date | 89108891.6 | 18.05.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | DE19883820706 | 18.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3820706 | [1989/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0347582 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0347582 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/44, F02M59/26 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
F02M55/001 (EP,US);
F02M59/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/52] | Title | German: | Einspritzpumpe für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1989/52] | English: | Injection pump for internal-combustion engines | [1989/52] | French: | Pompe d'injection pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1989/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 07.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/09] | 27.02.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59192841 ; | [X]FR2318320 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [Y]DE822453 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [Y]DE3539760 (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DE]); | [Y]GB434788 (GEORGES GRAUCE); | [A]US2305308 (HANS FISCHLMAYR) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 57 (M-363)(1780) 13 März 1985, & JP-A-59 192841 (NIPPON DENSO K.K.) 1 November 1984,, & JP59192841 A 19841101 |