EP0350602 - Method for welding rotors for ventilators by means of welding robots, [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/03] | Method for welding rotors for ventilators by means of welding robots, rotor and clamping tool | ||
[1993/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BABCOCK-BSH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG Postfach 6 47811 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states BABCOCK-BSH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hietzge, Richard Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 14 D-6430 Bad Hersfeld / DE | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/01] |
Former [1990/03] | Planker, Karl-Josef, Dipl.-Phys. Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG Parkstrasse 10 Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109307.2 | 23.05.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | DE19883823509 | 12.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3823509 | [1990/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350602 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350602 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350602 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23K31/00, // F04D29/26 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
B23K37/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schweissen von Rädern für Radialventilatoren mittels Schweissroboter | [1993/48] | English: | Method for welding rotors for ventilators by means of welding robots, | [1993/48] | French: | Méthode de soudage des roues de ventilateurs avec des robots de soudage, | [1993/48] |
Former [1990/03] | Verfahren zum Schweissen von Rädern für Radialventilatoren mittels Schweissroboter, Ventilatorrad und Spannwerkzeug | ||
Former [1990/03] | Method for welding rotors for ventilators by means of welding robots, rotor and clamping tool | ||
Former [1990/03] | Méthode de soudage des roues de ventilateurs avec des robots de soudage, roue de ventilateur et outil de serrage | Examination procedure | 03.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4322200 (STIEGELMEIER OWEN E); | [A]FR882188 (VOITH GMBH J M); | [A]GB2108411 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]DE3631154 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4333001 (NAKAHAMA SYUHEI, et al); | [A]DE3007098 (KLOECKNER WERKE AG [DE]); | [X]GB350763 (ERIE CITY IRON WORKS); | [YP]DE3700230 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG [DE]); | [A]DE1935013 (ELASTMETALL GMBH) |