EP0351521 - Crankcase ventilation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Töpfer, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Im Schönblick 4 D-7135 Iptingen / DE | [1990/04] | Application number, filing date | 89109354.4 | 24.05.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | DE19883824791 | 21.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3824791 | [1990/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351521 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351521 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351521 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01M13/00, F02M15/02 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
F02M15/022 (EP,US);
F01M13/025 (EP,US);
F01M5/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/04] | Title | German: | Kurbelgehäuseentlüftung | [1990/04] | English: | Crankcase ventilation | [1990/04] | French: | Ventilation du carter | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE952221 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [Y]FR1570558 ; | [A]US3116727 (DIETRICH HOWARD H); | [Y]DE3726332 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [YP]US4811697 (KURAHASHI TOSHIO [JP]); | [A]US2516547 (CARLSON HAROLD A, et al); | [A]FR1401955 ; | [AP]US4805564 (HUDSON JR SHARON J [US]); | [AD]US3364910 (HULSE CRANSTON W) |