EP0344618 - Gas-sampling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bernath, Tibor Lichtenbergweg 15 D-30974 Wennigsen / DE | [1989/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernath, Tibor Lichtenbergweg 15 D-30974 Wennigsen / DE | 02 /
Robotta, Werner Starenweg 15 D-30926 Seelze / DE | [1995/50] |
Former [1989/49] | 01 /
Bernath, Tibor Distelborn 6 D-3000 Hannover 91 / DE | ||
02 /
Robotta, Werner Starenweg 15 D-3000 Hannover / DE | |||
03 /
Dunse, Wilfried Egestorfer Strasse 58 D-3013 Barsinghausen / DE | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/49] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WUESTHOFF & WUESTHOFF Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109467.4 | 26.05.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | DE19883818372 | 30.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3818372 | [1989/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0344618 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0344618 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344618 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/22 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
G01N1/24 (EP);
G01N2001/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entnahme einer Gasprobe | [1989/49] | English: | Gas-sampling device | [1989/49] | French: | Dispositif de prélèvement d'échantillon de gaz | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU866443 ; | [X]US4008620 (NARATO KIYOSHI, et al); | [A]DE270351 ; | [A]US3680388 (CRITCHLEY DEREK, et al); | [A]GB1233325 | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Woche E28, 25. August 1982, Nr. 59235E/28, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & SU-A-866 443 (S.M. KHAIMS) 26-09-1981, & SU866443 A 00000000 |