EP0350607 - Use of calcium dihydrogen pyrophosphate as leavening acid in slow reacting leavening compositions and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.1992 [1992/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benckiser-Knapsack GmbH Dr. Albert-Reimann-Strasse 2 D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | [1990/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehret, Werner Schlossstrasse 20 D-6901 Wilhelmsfeld / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Jutta Im Gehklingen 37 D-6149 Rimbach / DE | 03 /
Gitzing, Roland, Dr. Sackgasse 4 D-6944 Hemsbach / DE | 04 /
Koch, Wilhelm, Dr. Im hinteren Reck 12 D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | 05 /
Maurer, Andrea, Dr. Siegfriedstrasse 14 D-6940 Weinhein / DE | 06 /
Tänzler, Richard, Dr. Grundelbachstrasse 112c D-6940 Weinheim / DE | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Grussdorf, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109562.2 | 26.05.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | DE19883820198 | 14.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3820198 | [1990/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350607 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350607 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/02, C01B25/42 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
C01B25/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Calciumdihydrogendiphosphat als Backtriebsäure für langsam reagierende Triebsysteme und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1990/03] | English: | Use of calcium dihydrogen pyrophosphate as leavening acid in slow reacting leavening compositions and method for producing the same | [1990/03] | French: | Utilisation de pyrophosphate bicalcique comme matière acide dans des levures chimiques et méthode pour sa préparation | [1990/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2195073 [ ]; | DE379295 [ ]; | DE302672 [ ]; | [AD]EP0015006 | [A] - BAKERS DIGEST, Band 57, Nr. 4, Juli/August 1983, Seiten 37-40, Chicago, Illinois, US; H.M. REIMAN: "Chemical leavening systems", Seite 38, Spalten 1,2; Seite 40, Spalte 3, Absatz 3. | [AD] - INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, Band 39, Nr. 12, Dezember 1947, Seiten 1667-1672; W.L. HILL et al.: "Acid pyro- and metphosphates produced by thermal decomposition of monocalcium phosphate", Seite 1670, Spalte 2, Absatz 2 - Seite 1671, Spalte 2. |