EP0345591 - Propanol amine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kienzle, Frank, Dr. Tannwaldweg 9 CH-4113 Flüh / CH | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109675.2 | 30.05.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | CH19880002245 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: CH 224588 | [1989/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345591 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345591 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/54, C07C215/48, C07D333/20, C07D213/36, A61K31/135, A61K31/215, A61K31/19, A61K31/38, A61K31/44, A23K1/16 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07C215/00 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07C215/02 (KR);
C07C215/52 (EP,US);
C07C217/60 (EP,US);
C07D333/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/50] | C07C93/14, C07C91/30, C07D333/20, C07D213/36, A61K31/135, A61K31/215, A61K31/19, A61K31/38, A61K31/44, A23K1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Propanolaminderivate | [1989/50] | English: | Propanol amine derivatives | [1989/50] | French: | Dérivés de la propanolamine | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3804899 (EBNOTHER A, et al); | [A]EP0007204 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [A]US4622342 (CANTELLO BARRIE C C [GB], et al) |