EP0349757 - Apparatus and method for enhanced virtual to real address translation for accessing a cache memory unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. 300 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821-4186 / US | [1995/34] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. Technology Park Billerica, MA 01821-4199 / US | ||
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. 300 Concord Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rabins, Leonard 8625 E. Monterosa Scottsdale AZ 85251 / US | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109786.7 | 31.05.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | US19880203490 | 07.06.1988 Original published format: US 203490 | [1997/16] |
Former [1990/02] | US19880203490 | 07.07.1988 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349757 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349757 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349757 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/10 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
G06F12/1054 (EP);
G06F12/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/02] | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zur verbesserten Umsetzung von virtueller zu realer Adresse für Cache-Speicherzugriff | [1990/02] | English: | Apparatus and method for enhanced virtual to real address translation for accessing a cache memory unit | [1990/02] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de traduction d'adresse virtuelle en adresse réelle améliorée pour accéder à une mémoire cache | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 11.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 12.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4170039 (BEACOM THOMAS J [US], et al); | [A]US4400774 (TOY WING N [US]); | [A]EP0206050 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 30, no. 10, March 1988, NEW YORK US pages 1 - 4; "FAST CACHE ACCESS BASED ON MOST RECENTLY USED HITS" | Examination | US4332010 | JPS5975482 |