EP0351524 - Clamp device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Egli, Fischer & Co. AG Gotthardstrasse 6 Claridenhof CH-8022 Zürich / CH | [1990/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freier, Fred Hinterer Engelstein 5 CH-8344 Bäretswil / CH | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 89109804.8 | 31.05.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | CH19880002739 | 18.07.1988 Original published format: CH 273988 | [1990/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0351524 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351524 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/12 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
F16L3/1203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/04] | Title | German: | Rohrschelle | [1990/04] | English: | Clamp device | [1990/04] | French: | Collier de fixation | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 02.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE3014578 (BS PLASTIKVERARBEITUNG GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2162416 (SAKAGUCHI PLASTIC IND); | [A]GB2183287 (TRW CARR FRANCE SA); | [E]EP0276640 (CATTANI OFF AUGUSTO & CO [IT]) |