EP0358852 - Device for transporting a fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Festo KG Ruiter Strasse 82 D-73734 Esslingen / DE | [1990/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoll, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Lenzhalde 72 D-7300 Esslingen / DE | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Magenbauer, Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Otto Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans Vetter Hölderlinweg 58 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Magenbauer, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Otto Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans Vetter Hölderlinweg 58 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89109904.6 | 01.06.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | DE19883827749 | 16.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3827749 | [1990/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358852 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358852 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/00, F16L9/18, F16L39/00, H02G3/26, H02G3/04, F15B13/00 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
F15B13/0814 (EP,US);
B23Q1/0009 (EP,US);
B23Q1/0018 (EP,US);
B23Q1/015 (EP,US);
F15B13/0821 (EP,US);
F15B13/086 (EP,US);
F15B13/0875 (EP,US);
F15B13/0889 (EP,US);
F15B13/0892 (EP,US);
F16L3/00 (EP,US);
F16L39/00 (EP,US);
F16L9/18 (EP,US);
H02G3/0487 (EP,US);
H02G3/263 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5283 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Führung eines Mediums | [1990/12] | English: | Device for transporting a fluid | [1990/12] | French: | Dispositif de transport de fluides | [1990/12] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 04.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3805847 (MANNING D); | [X]US4498693 (SCHINDELE ERNST F [US]); | [X]FR2439354 (ELAJO INVEST [SE]) |