EP0346771 - Method for making solid composite material particularly metal matrix with ceramic dispersates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/51] | Solid composite material particularly metal matrix with ceramic dispersates | ||
[1994/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester, MA 01606-2698 / US | [1989/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knapp, Christopher K. 2 Baker Road North Grimsby, Ontario L3M2W7 / CA | 02 /
Velken, Sjur Vidar Tingsakermoen N-4790 Lillesand / NO | 03 /
Cornie, James A. 285 Harvard Street No. 111 Cambridge Massachusetts / US | 04 /
Flemings, Merton C. 11 Hillside Avenue Cambridge Massachusetts / US | 05 /
Gorsuch, Donald R. 40 Valentine Road Northboro Massachusetts / US | 06 /
Klier, Eric 305 Summer Street Somerville Massachusetts / US | 07 /
Mortensen, Andreas 1010 Mass. Avenue No. 67 Cambridge Massachusetts / US | [1994/43] |
Former [1990/10] | 01 /
Knapp, Christopher K. 2 Baker Road North Grimsby, Ontario L3M2W7 / CA | ||
02 /
Velken, Sjur Vidar Tingsakermoen N, 4790 Lillesand / NO | |||
03 /
Cornie, James A. 285 Harvard Street No. 111 Cambridge Massachusetts / US | |||
04 /
Flemings, Merton C. 11 Hillside Avenue Cambridge Massachusetts / US | |||
05 /
Gorsuch, Donald R. 40 Valentine Road Northboro Massachusetts / US | |||
06 /
Klier, Eric 305 Summer Street Somerville Massachusetts / US | |||
07 /
Mortensen, Andreas 1010 Mass. Avenue No. 67 Cambridge Massachusetts / US | |||
Former [1989/51] | 01 /
Knapp, Christopher K. 115 Dufferin Street Hamilton Ontario, L8S 3N5 / CA | ||
02 /
Velken, Sjur Vidar Tingsakermoen N, 4790 Lillesand / NO | |||
03 /
Cornie, James A. 285 Harvard Street No. 111 Cambridge Massachusetts / US | |||
04 /
Flemings, Merton C. 11 Hillside Avenue Cambridge Massachusetts / US | |||
05 /
Gorsuch, Donald R. 40 Valentine Road Northboro Massachusetts / US | |||
06 /
Klier, Eric 305 Summer Street Somerville Massachusetts / US | |||
07 /
Mortensen, Andreas 1010 Mass. Avenue No. 67 Cambridge Massachusetts / US | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/51] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110482.0 | 09.06.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | US19880208086 | 17.06.1988 Original published format: US 208086 | US19880208084 | 17.06.1988 Original published format: US 208084 | [1989/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346771 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346771 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/10 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
C22C32/0063 (EP);
C22C1/04 (KR);
C22C1/1021 (EP);
C22C1/1036 (EP);
C22C32/00 (EP);
C22C32/0052 (EP);
C22C32/0057 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Verbundwerkstoff, insbesondere eine Metallmatrix mit dispergierten Keramikteilchen | [1994/43] | English: | Method for making solid composite material particularly metal matrix with ceramic dispersates | [1994/43] | French: | Procédé d'obtention d'un matériau composite, particulièrement une matrice métallique avec une dispersion céramique | [1994/43] |
Former [1989/51] | Verbundwerkstoff, insbesondere eine Metallmatrix mit dispergierten Keramikteilchen | ||
Former [1989/51] | Solid composite material particularly metal matrix with ceramic dispersates | ||
Former [1989/51] | Matériau composite, particulièrement une matrice métallique avec une dispersion céramique | Examination procedure | 06.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.1994 | BE | 26.10.1994 | CH | 26.10.1994 | ES | 26.10.1994 | FR | 26.10.1994 | IT | 26.10.1994 | LI | 26.10.1994 | NL | 26.10.1994 | SE | 26.01.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
CH | 26.10.1994 | ||
ES | 26.10.1994 | ||
IT | 26.10.1994 | ||
LI | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
FR | 24.03.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
CH | 26.10.1994 | ||
IT | 26.10.1994 | ||
LI | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
FR | 24.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
CH | 26.10.1994 | ||
LI | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
FR | 24.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
CH | 26.10.1994 | ||
LI | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/31] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
CH | 26.10.1994 | ||
LI | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
SE | 26.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2793949 (GEORGES IMICH); | [X]EP0104682 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [Y]EP0150519 (TNO [NL]); | [YD]EP0256600 (NUOVA SAMIN SPA [IT]); | [Y]US4741973 (CONDIT DAVID A [US], et al) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF METALS, February 1988, pages 12-19, New York, US; A. MORTENSEN et al.: "Solidification processing of metal-matrix composites" | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, vol. 13, no. 1, January 1978, pages 329-335, Chapman and Hall Ltd; B.C. PAI et al.: "Production of cast aluminium-graphite particle composites using a pellet method" |