EP0347740 - Thermal recording head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.1992 [1992/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koshizuka, Kunihiro c/o Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kitamura, Shigehiro c/o Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mano, Shigeru c/o Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Abe, Takao c/o Konica Corporation 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89110836.7 | 14.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | JP19880154021 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15402188 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347740 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/20 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
B41J2/33535 (EP,US);
B41J2/3357 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/52] | Title | German: | Wärmeaufzeichnungskopf | [1989/52] | English: | Thermal recording head | [1989/52] | French: | Tête d'enregistrement thermique | [1989/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 10.12.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0194528 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3614840 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3721925 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4746933 (ASAKURA OSAMU [JP]) |