EP0348744 - Trialkylsilyloxy-1,1-disphenyl-ethylenes and polymers prepared therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leitz, Edgar, Dr. Goethestrasse 63 D-4047 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
Buysch, Hans-Josef, Dr. Brandenburger Strasse 28 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Bottenbruch, Ludwig, Dr. Wöhlerstrasse 5 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Ott, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 54 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | [1990/01] | Application number, filing date | 89110850.8 | 15.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | DE19883821745 | 28.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3821745 | [1990/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348744 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348744 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C08F30/08 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C08F30/08 (EP,US);
C08F8/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/01] | Title | German: | Trialkylsilyloxy-1,1-diphenyl-ethylene und damit hergestellte Polymere | [1990/01] | English: | Trialkylsilyloxy-1,1-disphenyl-ethylenes and polymers prepared therewith | [1990/01] | French: | Trialcoylsilyloxy-1,1-disphényl-éthylènes et les polymères préparés avec ceux-ci | [1990/01] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - DIE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, Band 190, Nr. 3, März 1989, Seiten 487-493, Basel, CH; R.P. QUIRK et al.: "Anionic synthesis of chain-end functionalized polymers using 1,1-diphenylethylene derivatives. Preparation of 4-hydroxyphenyl-terminated polystyrenes" | [A] - MACROMOLECULES, Band 10, Nr. 6, November-Dezember 1977, Seiten 1320-1326, Washington, DC; R. BUSSON et al.: "Hammett relations in anionic polymerization. Reaction of polystyrylalkali salts with disubstituted 1,1-diphenylethylenes" | [A] - DIE MAKROMOLEKULARE CHEMIE, Band 186, 1985, Seiten 1157-1166, Basel, CH; A. HIRAO et al.: "Polymerization of monomers containing functional groups protected by trialkylsilyl groups, 4" |